judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00787-CR
14-89-00787-CR
08/21/1989
Unauth. Use of Motor Vehical
Brown, Eddie Dean
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/19/1990Mandate Issued
09/19/1990Mandate Issued
09/10/1990Case stored
09/04/1990No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
08/17/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
08/02/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
08/02/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
08/01/1990Submitted
08/01/1990Submission
08/01/1990Submitted
05/03/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
05/03/1990Case ready to be set
05/03/1990Case ready to be set
04/19/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
04/12/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/15/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
02/22/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
02/15/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/18/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
01/12/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/15/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
12/15/1989Transcript FILED
08/21/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/17/1989Date of Sentence
08/17/1989Motion for new trial FILED
08/17/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/10/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasRoger A. Haseman
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantCarl Webster
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
178th District Court
Harris
509,969
40 years TDC