judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-89-00445-CV
04-89-00445-CV
09/18/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Juanita Mireles
Eligio Alvarez
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/17/1990Case Returned from Higher Court
12/17/1990Mandate Issued
12/17/1990Mandate Issued
11/28/1990Motion for Rehearing Disposed
10/31/1990Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Denied
07/25/1990Information regarding cause received
07/03/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
07/02/1990Writ of Error filed
05/30/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/08/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/07/1990Motion EOT to file Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/20/1990Motion EOT to file Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/04/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Rendered
04/04/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Rendered
03/16/1990Waives Oral Argument
03/14/1990Submitted
03/14/1990Submission
03/14/1990Submitted
02/20/1990Waives Oral Argument
02/12/1990Submission
01/18/1990Case ready to be set
01/18/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/18/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/18/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/18/1990Case ready to be set
01/17/1990Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
01/17/1990Requests Oral Argument
01/17/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
01/17/1990Brief Filed
01/10/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
01/05/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/14/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
11/27/1989Requests Oral Argument
11/27/1989Brief Filed
10/31/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/30/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
10/30/1989Information regarding cause received
10/30/1989Information regarding cause received
10/13/1989No Description Available.
10/02/1989No Description Available.Motion Granted in Part
10/02/1989No Description Available.Motion Granted in Part
10/02/1989No Description Available.Motion Granted in Part
09/29/1989Information regarding cause received
09/25/1989Verification Filed
09/18/1989No Description Available.
09/18/1989No Description Available.
09/18/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/14/1989No Description Available.
08/17/1989Appeal Bond Filed
05/22/1989Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/17/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court
Starr
Honorable Alex William Gabert
88-59
n/a