judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1274-89
PD-1274-89
09/19/1989
PDR Case Type
LANE, JAMES C., JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
09/26/1989RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/10/1989FINAL DISPRefused
10/25/1989PDR DISPRefused
09/26/1989RESPONSE FILED
09/19/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/20/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateTim Curry
LANE, JAMES C.JR.Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Richard Alley
Court of Appeals Information:
02-88-00205-CR
Aff 7-27-89
2nd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
213th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable George S. Kredell
0311982D