judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-94-00329-CV
01-94-00329-CV
04/07/1994
Miscellaneous/other civil
Cox, Mary Frances, et al, Proponent
Georgette Hagar Oakes, Contestant
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/11/1995Mandate issued - criminal or civil
10/11/1995Mandate issued - criminal or civil
09/19/1995Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
05/23/1995Case file received by higher Court or agency.
05/19/1995Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
05/15/1995Writ filed
05/13/1995Writ Due
04/13/1995Extension of time to file mtn. for rehearing disp.Grant motion
04/13/1995Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
04/13/1995Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
03/23/1995Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
03/17/1995Extension of time to file motion for rehearing
03/17/1995Motion for rehearing filed
03/17/1995Motion for rehearing filed
03/03/1995Motion for Rehearing Due
03/03/1995Motion for rehearing was not filed
03/02/1995Extension of time to file mtn. for rehearing disp.Grant motion
02/17/1995Extension of time to file motion for rehearing
02/02/1995Opinion issuedReversed and Rendered
02/02/1995Opinion issuedReversed and Rendered
01/20/1995Supplemental brief filed
01/17/1995Submitted
01/17/1995Submission
01/17/1995Submitted
01/05/1995Supplemental brief filed
12/22/1994Motion to strike filedMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
12/21/1994Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
12/06/1994Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
11/21/1994Submission
11/17/1994Motion strans disposedGrant motion
11/17/1994Supplemental transcript filed
11/14/1994Motion to strike filed
11/03/1994Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
11/03/1994Case ready to be set
11/03/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
11/03/1994Case ready to be set
11/02/1994Motion for leave to file strans
10/13/1994Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
10/10/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
10/06/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
09/23/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
08/29/1994Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
07/28/1994Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
07/28/1994Statement of facts filed
06/16/1994Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
06/13/1994Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
06/13/1994No description available.
04/21/1994Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
04/11/1994Filing fee in the amount of $55.00 paid
04/11/1994Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
04/07/1994Transcript filed
04/07/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/14/1994Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/11/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppelleeL. A. Al Greene, Jr.
StateAppellantKenneth H. Knop
StateAppellantRobert I. Peeples
Trial Court Information
Probate Court No 1
Harris
255,527