judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-96-01804-CR
05-96-01804-CR
11/15/1996
Other Felony
Saldana, Eliezer Tito
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/03/1998Mandate Issued
08/03/1998Mandate Issued
05/22/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/22/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/21/1998Submitted
05/21/1998Submission
05/21/1998Submitted
05/01/1998Submission
07/02/1997Brief Filed
07/02/1997Case ready to be set
07/02/1997MattConv
07/02/1997Case ready to be set
03/22/1997MattConv
03/21/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/19/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/05/1997Transcript Filed
02/25/1997Brief Filed
02/22/1997Record due
01/23/1997Statement of Facts Filed
11/20/1996Notice Sent
11/15/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/05/1996Motion for New Trial Filed
10/28/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
10/25/1996Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/03/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasMichael J. Sandlin
Saldana, Eliezer TitoCriminal - AppellantRuss Henrichs
Trial Court Information
203rd Judicial District Court
Dallas
F86-78678-LP
10 Yrs Pen