judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-96-01800-CR
05-96-01800-CR
11/15/1996
Ander's
Davis, Charles Edwards Jr.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/13/2000Letter Sent by the Court
01/03/2000Letter Received
09/24/1998Mandate Issued
09/24/1998Mandate Issued
07/02/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/02/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/01/1998Submitted
07/01/1998Submission
07/01/1998Submitted
06/10/1998Submission
11/28/1997Pro Se Brief Due
09/30/1997Pro Se Brief Due
08/30/1997Pro Se Brief Due
08/25/1997Letter Filed
08/18/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/15/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/15/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/15/1997Order EnteredOtherwise Disposed
08/08/1997Letter Received
07/17/1997Letter Sent by the Court
07/11/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/10/1997MattConv
07/02/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/01/1997MattConv
07/01/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/01/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/01/1997Order EnteredOtherwise Disposed
06/24/1997Motion to Withdraw Attorney
06/23/1997Letter Sent by the Court
06/23/1997MattConv
06/23/1997MattConv
06/19/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/13/1997Letter Sent by the Court
06/06/1997Brief Filed
04/17/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/15/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/13/1997MattConv
03/18/1997Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
03/14/1997Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
03/14/1997Statement of Facts Filed
03/05/1997Letter Filed
03/01/1997Record due
02/18/1997MattConv
01/16/1997Transcript Filed
11/20/1996Notice Sent
11/15/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/12/1996Motion for New Trial Filed
11/04/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
11/01/1996Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/24/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Davis, Charles Edwards Jr.Criminal - AppellantDouglas H. Parks
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasSue Korioth
Trial Court Information
282nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Thomas Thorpe
F95-53068-S
Life