judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-96-01812-CR
05-96-01812-CR
11/15/1996
Felony DWI
Juarez, Victorino Rodriguez
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/08/2000Record RetentionDestroy
01/09/1998Mandate Issued
01/09/1998Mandate Issued
10/21/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/21/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/13/1997Submitted
10/13/1997Submission
10/13/1997Submitted
07/28/1997Supplemental Transcript filed
07/14/1997Case reinstated
07/14/1997Case reinstated
07/08/1997Statement of Facts Filed
07/01/1997Supplemental Record Due
05/23/1997Order EnteredAbated
05/23/1997Order EnteredAbated
02/18/1997MattConv
01/17/1997Transcript Filed
01/04/1997Record due
11/20/1996Notice Sent
11/15/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/05/1996Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
11/05/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/09/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasSue Korioth
Juarez, VIctorino RodriguezCriminal - AppellantDonna M. Winfield
Trial Court Information
282nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Thomas Thorpe
F96-23114-S