judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00919-CR
01-89-00919-CR
09/14/1989
Other Felony
State of Texas
Garrett, Craig Anthony
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/13/1992Mandate issued - criminal or civil
03/13/1992Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/22/1992Higher court decisionAffirmed
11/30/1990Case file received by higher Court or agency.
11/28/1990Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
11/13/1990Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
10/18/1990Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
09/06/1990Motion for rehearing filed
08/23/1990Opinion issuedReversed
08/23/1990Opinion issuedReversed
03/13/1990Submitted
03/13/1990Submission
03/13/1990Submitted
01/26/1990Submission
11/30/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
11/30/1989Case ready to be set
11/30/1989Case ready to be set
11/09/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
10/27/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
10/12/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
09/28/1989Statement of facts filed
09/15/1989Transcript filed
09/14/1989Notice of appeal filed
09/14/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/12/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/13/1992Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - AppellantRandy Schaffer
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StateCriminal - State of TexasTed Wilson
StateCriminal - State of TexasHon. John M. Bradley
Trial Court Information
339th District Court
Harris
519,605
case quashed