judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-96-01788-CR
05-96-01788-CR
11/15/1996
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Alexander, Margaret
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/15/1999Letter Sent by the Court
06/14/1999Letter Received
10/28/1998Mandate Issued
10/28/1998Mandate Issued
07/31/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/31/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/20/1998Submitted
05/20/1998Submission
05/20/1998Submitted
04/17/1998Brief Filed
03/26/1998Letter Filed
03/23/1998Letter Filed
03/16/1998Submission
09/21/1997Case ready to be set
09/21/1997MattConv
09/21/1997Case ready to be set
08/27/1997Brief Filed
08/27/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/15/1997Brief Received
08/12/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/31/1997MattConv
07/10/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/09/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/01/1997MattConv
05/16/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/09/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/02/1997MattConv
04/02/1997Case reinstated
04/02/1997Case reinstated
03/27/1997Supplemental Transcript filed
03/05/1997MattConv
02/06/1997Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
02/03/1997Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
02/03/1997Statement of Facts Filed
01/30/1997Motion to Withdraw Attorney DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/30/1997Order EnteredAbated
01/30/1997Order EnteredAbated
01/27/1997Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Denied
01/22/1997Mot for Ext Transcript DispMotion or Writ Granted
01/17/1997Mot - Ext. to File Transcript
01/17/1997Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
01/17/1997Motion to Withdraw Attorney
01/14/1997Transcript Filed
12/29/1996Record due
11/20/1996Notice Sent
11/15/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/30/1996Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
10/30/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/28/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasMichael J. Sandlin
Alexander, MargaretCriminal - AppellantJohn H. Hagler
Trial Court Information
283rd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Virgil Mulanax
F96-02814-ST
99 Yrs Pen