judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-89-00285-CV
08-89-00285-CV
08/07/1989
Tax
Ward County Appraisal District & Appraisal Review Board for
G.Q. Avary, Jr., et al.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/02/2011Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk
03/17/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
04/27/1990Shuck purged
04/27/1990Mandate Issued
04/27/1990Mandate Issued
02/28/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
02/15/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
01/31/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed/Reversed & Rendered
01/31/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed/Reversed & Rendered
01/18/1990Submitted
01/18/1990Submission
01/18/1990Submitted
01/16/1990Waiver of brief, list of authorities, etc.
01/04/1990Brief Filed
12/01/1989Submission
11/13/1989Brief Filed
11/13/1989Case ready to be set
11/13/1989Case ready to be set
10/17/1989Brief Filed
09/27/1989Motion to supplement disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/27/1989Supplemental Transcript Filed
09/18/1989Statement of Facts Filed
09/14/1989Fee paid
09/14/1989Motion to supplement filed
09/13/1989Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/05/1989Payment of fee due requested
09/05/1989Transcript Filed
09/01/1989Fee paid
09/01/1989Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
08/23/1989Motion for Ext Transcript DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/15/1989Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion
08/15/1989Fee paid
08/07/1989Motion - Extension to File Transcript filed
08/07/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/07/1989Payment of fee due requested
08/07/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/17/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppelleeHon. William M. Kerr
UnknownAppellantHon. Scott D. Wylie
UnknownAppellantHon. Russell R. Graham
Trial Court Information
143rd District Court
Ward
Honorable Bob Parks
880815587cvw