judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00806-CV
01-89-00806-CV
08/07/1989
Divorce
Winfield, David Mark
Renfro, Sandra
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/30/1989Mandate issued - criminal or civil
10/30/1989Mandate issued - criminal or civil
10/26/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
10/26/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
10/12/1989Motion to dismiss appeal
09/13/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
08/25/1989Motion to dismiss appeal
08/15/1989Statement of facts filed
08/11/1989Filing fee paid
08/07/1989Transcript filed
08/07/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/14/1989Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/30/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppelleeEarle S. S. Lilly
StateAppellantTom Alexander
StateAppelleeJeffrey H. Uzick
Trial Court Information
310th District Court
Harris
85-06426