judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8943
C-8943
08/08/1989
App Writ of Error
BRENDA POWERS and BRADFORD CONDIT
PAUL PALACIOS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
11/07/1989Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/22/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent
08/08/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
01/04/1990Record returned to Court of AppealsREHEARING OVERRULED
01/03/1990Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruled
11/16/1989Motion for Rehearing forwarded
11/07/1989Motion for Rehearing
10/25/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedAS SUPPLEMENTED.
10/25/1989Motion to strike disposedOverruled
09/06/1989Motion to Strike filedRESP MOTION TO STRIKE PET'S SUPP APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ERROR
08/31/1989supp to app writ errorCOMBINED W/PET'S REPLY BRIEF
08/23/1989Case forwarded to Court
08/23/1989No description available.
08/22/1989Reply to Response
08/08/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
01/04/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
13-88-00211-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
771 Sw2d 716, 05-25-89
13th Court of Appeals
Honorable ROBERT J. SEERDEN
Trial Court Information
94th District Court
Nueces
Honorable Jack E. Hunter
87-6693-C