judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1603-96
PD-1603-96
11/14/1996
PDR Case Type
ROBERTS, ROBERT EUGENE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/14/1997SUPP BR FILEDAppellant
04/24/1997BRIEF FILEDAppellant
03/24/1997BRIEF FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/31/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate of a process
12/31/1997MANDATE ISSD
12/10/1997OPINION ISSDReversed COA; Remanded COA
12/10/1997OPINION ISSDReversed COA; Remanded COA
12/10/1997OPINION ISSDReversed COA; Remanded COA
06/04/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted of a process
06/04/1997SUBMITTED
05/15/1997NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT
05/14/1997SUPP BR FILED
05/01/1997NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT
04/24/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission of a process
04/24/1997BRIEF FILED
04/24/1997SET FOR SUBMIS
03/24/1997BRIEF FILED
02/26/1997PDR GRANTED
02/26/1997PDR DISPGranted
02/26/1997PDR DISPGranted
12/17/1996NO RESPONSE FILED
11/14/1996PDR FILED
11/14/1996PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/26/1997STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn B. Holmes
Roberts, Robert EugeneApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Roland Brice Moore III
Court of Appeals Information:
14-94-00573-CR
REV & REM 10-10-96
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
339th District Court
Harris
Honorable CAPRICE COSPER
679630