judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-96-00533-CR
02-96-00533-CR
11/14/1996
All Misdemeanors
State of Texas
Jordan, Quentin Lavan
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/22/2000Mandate Issued
02/11/2000Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
09/07/1999Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
08/05/1999Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/16/1999Motion for Rehearing Filed
07/01/1999Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/26/1999Letter
02/12/1999Submitted
02/12/1999Submission
12/28/1998Brief Filed
11/30/1998Letter
11/30/1998Letter
11/23/1998Submission
11/23/1998Letter
11/19/1998Case reinstated
11/19/1998Case reinstated
11/06/1998Mandate Issued
10/21/1998Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCAMotion or Writ Granted
10/21/1998Opinion issuedRemanded to Trial Court
11/04/1997Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/23/1997Motion Filed
10/21/1997Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
10/16/1997Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
05/20/1997Submitted
05/20/1997Submission
05/16/1997Letter
02/04/1997Brief Filed
02/04/1997Case ready to be set
02/03/1997Submission
02/03/1997Supplemental Brief Filed
02/03/1997Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/29/1997Motion Filed
01/27/1997Brief Filed
11/14/1996Criminal record or relator's record and/or exhibits
11/14/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/22/2000Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasMatthew W. Paul
Jordan, Quentin LavanAppelleeLarry G. Coker
Edward Gail Jones
Richard Alley
Unknown UserAppellantCharles M. Mallin
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 4
Tarrant
Honorable Wallace Bowman, Judge, County Criminal Court No. 4
0619641