judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1126-89
PD-1126-89
08/10/1989
PDR Case Type
CHILES, DANNY NAPOLEON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/10/1989FINAL DISPRefused
10/25/1989PDR DISPRefused
09/13/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
08/10/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/20/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateCappy Eads
CHILES, DANNY NAPOLEONApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Mark E. Danford
Court of Appeals Information:
03-88-00191-CR
aff 6-28-89
3rd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
27th District Court
Bell
Honorable Jack W. Prescott
36,578