judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-89-00207-CR
02-89-00207-CR
08/09/1989
Other Drug Sale
Moore, Curtis Lynn
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/17/2001Order Entered
04/17/1991Mandate Issued
03/13/1991Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
01/02/1991Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
12/27/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
12/07/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
12/05/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/15/1990Brief Filed
10/02/1990Brief Filed
09/20/1990Order Entered
09/04/1990Submitted
09/04/1990Submission
03/19/1990Brief Filed
02/23/1990Brief Filed
02/23/1990Submission
01/18/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/17/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
12/21/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/21/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
11/27/1989No Description Available.
11/15/1989No Description Available.
11/15/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
11/15/1989Notice to Attorneys of no Brief Filed
10/13/1989No Description Available.
10/13/1989Request for Extension of Recorder's Record DisposdMotion or Writ Granted
09/08/1989No Description Available.
08/09/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/09/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/17/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Moore, Curtis LynnCriminal - Appellant
Unknown UserCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
355th District Court
Hood
Honorable Clifford Davis
5878
50 yrs., TDC.