judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00750-CR
14-89-00750-CR
08/11/1989
Other Drug Sale or Delivery
Gonzales, Michael Enis
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/29/1991Case stored
03/27/1991Mandate Issued
03/27/1991Mandate Issued
03/12/1991Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
02/13/1991Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
12/10/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
12/03/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
11/16/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
11/01/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
11/01/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
09/18/1990Submitted
09/18/1990Submission
09/18/1990Submitted
08/21/1990Submission
06/13/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
06/13/1990Case ready to be set
06/13/1990Case ready to be set
05/31/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
05/25/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
05/03/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
04/26/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/29/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/22/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
03/22/1990Mtn.supplement record DISPOSED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,STAGRANTED
03/22/1990Order Entered
03/16/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/16/1990Mtn.to supplement record FILED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,STA
03/07/1990No description available.
02/08/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
01/31/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/23/1990No description available.
12/21/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
12/21/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
12/19/1989Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL
12/13/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
12/08/1989No description available.
12/05/1989Transcript FILED
09/08/1989Motion for new trial FILED
08/11/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/09/1989Date of Sentence
08/09/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/29/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasJ. Harvey Hudson
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
176th District Court
Harris
Honorable JAMES BRIAN RAINS
511,964
60 years TDC/$150,000 fine