judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00820-CR
01-89-00820-CR
08/09/1989
Other Drug Possession
Le Blanc Jr., Morris
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/20/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
08/20/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
07/28/1990No petition for review or writ of error was filed
07/13/1990Motion for rehearing was not filed
06/28/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/28/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/08/1990Supplemental transcript filed
04/19/1990Order enteredOrder trial court hearing-no brief filed
11/08/1989Brief due for retained counsel
10/06/1989Transcript filed
08/09/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/07/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
08/07/1989Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/20/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - AppellantYardley B. Kennedy
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 14
Harris
8915430
$350.00 / 3 dys, 2dys cred