judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-8275
A-8275
03/02/1961
Application for Writ of Error
STEWART TITLE GUARANTY COMPANY
LUNT LAND CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/22/1961Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/05/1961Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
03/17/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
03/14/1961Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/02/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/27/1961Response to Motion filed
06/22/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/07/1961Opinion issued
05/05/1961Supplemental Brief filed
04/05/1961Document received (See Remarks)
03/17/1961Response to Petition
03/14/1961Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/02/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/02/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lunt Land CorporationRespondent
Stewart Title Guaranty CompanyPetitioner
C. C. RenfroAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information