judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-89-00194-CV
09-89-00194-CV
08/04/1989
Probate of Will Contests
Schmutte, Mildred, D.D. Jacobs and Coleman Stone
Sellers, W.R., et al
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/16/1992Mandate Issued
07/06/1992Case Returned from Higher Ct.
07/01/1992Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
06/10/1992Order Entered
04/17/1991Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/13/1991Petition for WritMotion or Writ Denied
12/05/1990Petition for WritFiled in Higher Court
11/21/1990Petition for Writ
10/24/1990Miscellaneous MotionsMotion or Writ Granted
10/04/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
10/03/1990Response
09/25/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
09/13/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/01/1990Mot. for Ext. File Sup. Brief
08/01/1990Mot.-Ext. File Sup Brief DispMotion or Writ Granted
08/01/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
08/01/1990Supplemental Brief Received
07/19/1990Mot.-Ext. File Sup Brief DispMotion or Writ Granted
07/18/1990Mot. for Ext. File Sup. Brief
07/18/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
07/18/1990Supplemental Brief Received
06/11/1990Mot.-Ext. File Sup Brief DispMotion or Writ Granted
06/11/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
06/07/1990Mot. for Ext. File Sup. Brief
06/07/1990Supplemental Brief Received
05/31/1990Submitted
05/31/1990Submission
05/16/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
03/23/1990Submission
10/17/1989Brief Filed
10/17/1989Case ready to be set
09/27/1989Letter
09/22/1989Brief Filed
08/23/1989Supplemental Transcript filed
08/04/1989Transcript Filed
08/04/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/16/1992Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
W.r. SellersAppellee
Mildred SchmutteAppellantRobert W. Eutsler
D.d. JacobsAppellantRobert W. Eutsler
Virginia Kahn CooglerAppelleeGerald J. Creighton
Coleman StoneAppellantRobert W. Eutsler
Ad Litem For Kahn MinorsCivil - Ad LitemDon Stocking
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 1
Montgomery
Honorable Suzanne H Stovall
7796