judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00933-CR
05-89-00933-CR
08/03/1989
Other Felony
Renfro, Michael Allen
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/03/1990Mandate Issued
08/03/1990Mandate Issued
06/06/1990Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
06/06/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/06/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/05/1990Submitted
06/05/1990Submission
06/05/1990Submission
06/05/1990Submitted
04/11/1990MattConv
02/15/1990Brief Filed
02/15/1990Case ready to be set
02/15/1990Case ready to be set
01/22/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/18/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/21/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/18/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/21/1989Brief Filed
11/17/1989Transcript Filed
08/21/1989Exhibits Filed
08/16/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/03/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/20/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
07/20/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/03/1990Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
194th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable F. H. Entz
F89-95139-M
35 yrs TDC