judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-89-00375-CR
04-89-00375-CR
08/04/1989
All Misdemeanors
M & M Contracting of Texas
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/25/1990Mandate received by the trial court
05/22/1990Mandate Issued
05/22/1990Mandate Issued
03/30/1990No New Event but Update in Calendar
03/30/1990Opinion issuedDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
03/30/1990Opinion issuedDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
03/28/1990Submitted
03/28/1990Submission
03/28/1990Submitted
03/27/1990No New Event but Update in Calendar
02/21/1990No New Event but Update in Calendar
02/12/1990No New Event but Update in Calendar
01/22/1990Submission
12/15/1989Brief Filed
12/15/1989Case ready to be set
12/15/1989Case ready to be set
11/28/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/27/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
11/01/1989Brief Filed
10/17/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/16/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
09/18/1989No Description Available.
08/11/1989No Description Available.
08/04/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/31/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/20/1989Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/22/1990Case StoredCase stored
05/22/2015RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 8
Bexar
Honorable Miguel Rodriguez
87682
$75.00 fine