judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8937
C-8937
08/04/1989
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
THE CITY OF GRANITE SHOALS ET AL.
THE HONORABLE D. V. HAMMOND JUDGE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/04/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/03/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/02/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
10/02/1989Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedRespondentREAL PARTIES/LESLIE WALKER ET AL.
09/27/1989Motion for RehearingRelator
08/04/1989Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/04/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/03/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/02/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
10/20/1989Case StoredMO/RE OF M/L/F OR
10/18/1989Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruled
10/02/1989Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedREAL PARTIES/LESLIE WALKER ET AL.
09/27/1989Motion for Rehearing
09/27/1989Motion for Rehearing forwarded
09/13/1989M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedOverruledREQ.F/TEMP. RELIEF OVERRULED
09/13/1989Motion for temporary relief disposedOverruled
08/21/1989Letter FiledLETTER REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT AFTER AUGUST 25, 1989
08/04/1989Brief in Support of Petition
08/04/1989Exhibits received
08/04/1989Motion for temporary relief
08/04/1989Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
08/04/1989No description available.
08/04/1989Petition for writ received
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
10/20/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
WALKER, CARL M.RespondentMr. William C. Schmidt
ROGERS, WOODYRelatorMr. Arthur L. Walker
MCQUAIDE, ANNETTERelatorMr. Arthur L. Walker
HALDY, WILLIAMRelatorMr. Arthur L. Walker
HENRY, SIMRespondentMr. William C. Schmidt
WALKER, LESLIE & CYNTHIARespondentMr. William C. Schmidt
SHERWOOD SHORES TRUST FUNDRespondentMr. William C. Schmidt
WALKER, JOHNATHAN LEERespondentMr. William C. Schmidt
FERGUSON, CLANCY (DECEASED)RelatorMr. Arthur L. Walker
BECKER, MARJORIERelatorMr. Arthur L. Walker
UPDEGRAFF, RICHARD (DECEASED)RelatorMr. Arthur L. Walker
Court of Appeals Information:
03-89-00000-CV
Overruled
3rd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
33rd District Court
Burnet
Honorable D. V. Hammond
12,295