judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-89-00176-CV
02-89-00176-CV
08/04/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Texas, The State of
One 1982 Datsun Automobile,et al. (Sumerlin, Hoover)
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/20/1989Mandate Issued
10/05/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
10/05/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/29/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
09/01/1989Submission
09/01/1989No Description Available.
08/04/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/04/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/20/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
297th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable John E Bradshaw
297-967