judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8934
C-8934
08/04/1989
App Writ of Error
UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
UNITED SERVICE AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION AND ANNA MILLIKEN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
04/09/1990Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedRespondent
03/22/1990Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/21/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent
08/04/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
04/11/1990Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruledREHEARING OVERRULED
04/11/1990Record returned to Court of AppealsREHEARING OVERRULED
04/09/1990Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed
03/29/1990Motion for Rehearing forwarded
03/28/1990Notice requesting filing fee
03/22/1990Motion for Rehearing
03/07/1990Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedWRIT DENIED
08/23/1989Case forwarded to Court
08/23/1989Case forwarded to Court
08/23/1989No description available.
08/21/1989Reply to Response
08/04/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
04/11/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-01042-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
772 SW2d 218, 05-11-89
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable Warren Whitham
Trial Court Information
162nd District Court
Dallas
Honorable Catherine J. Crier
87-11911-I