judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00827-CR
05-89-00827-CR
07/17/1989
Other Felony
Brooks, Jr., George William
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/10/2020Order enteredDestroy
05/29/1990Mandate Issued
05/29/1990Mandate Issued
05/14/1990Case Returned from Higher Ct.
01/05/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FiledRefused
12/06/1989Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
11/15/1989Motion for Rehearing Filed
11/06/1989Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
11/06/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/06/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/30/1989Submission
10/30/1989Submitted
10/30/1989Submission
10/30/1989Submitted
10/16/1989Brief Filed
10/06/1989Brief Filed
09/25/1989MattConv
09/22/1989Statement of Facts Filed
09/12/1989Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/08/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
09/08/1989Motion for Leave to File
09/01/1989Mot for Ext Transcript DispMotion or Writ Granted
08/31/1989Extend Time to File Record
08/25/1989Transcript Filed
07/17/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/10/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
07/10/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/10/2020Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 3
Collin
3-678-88
Double Jeopardy