judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00830-CV
05-89-00830-CV
07/17/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Myers, Myron
Elizabeth M. Ribble
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/27/1997Record RetentionRetain
09/21/1990Mandate Issued
09/21/1990Mandate Issued
07/27/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
07/27/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
02/13/1990Submission
02/13/1990Submitted
02/13/1990Submission
02/13/1990Submitted
12/29/1989Letter Filed
12/21/1989MattConv
10/03/1989Supplemental Transcript filed
10/03/1989Case ready to be set
09/26/1989Mot Ext Time File Strans Disp
09/25/1989Response to Motion
09/22/1989Brief Filed
09/21/1989Response to Motion
09/15/1989Mot Ext Time File Strans
09/11/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/06/1989Amended Brief Filed
08/29/1989Letter Sent by the Court
08/28/1989Brief Filed
08/28/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/16/1989Motion - Ext to File Bond DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/07/1989MattConv
07/26/1989Transcript Filed
07/26/1989Transcript Tendered
07/24/1989Response to Motion
07/17/1989Appeal Bond Filed
07/17/1989MattConv
07/17/1989Motion - Ext. to File Bond
07/17/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/02/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/21/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
14th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable John M Marshall
88-1075-A