judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00728-CR
01-89-00728-CR
07/17/1989
Other Drug Possession
Sherman, James Charles
Texas, The State of
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/14/1990Motion to publish opinion or order of courtGrant motion
07/19/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
07/19/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
06/22/1990Motion to publish opinion or order of court
06/16/1990No petition for review or writ of error was filed
06/01/1990Motion for rehearing was not filed
05/17/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/17/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/01/1990Submitted
05/01/1990Submission
05/01/1990Submitted
03/28/1990Submission
12/12/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
12/12/1989Case ready to be set
12/12/1989Case ready to be set
11/22/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
11/09/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
10/26/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
09/28/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
09/28/1989Statement of facts filed
09/14/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
09/06/1989Transcript filed
07/17/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/11/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
07/11/1989Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/19/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - AppellantJeffrey S. Reddall
StateCriminal - State of TexasCalvin A. Hartmann
StateCriminal - State of TexasDi Glaeser
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
Trial Court Information
337th District Court
Harris
521,656
25 yrs tdc