judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-89-00278-CV
13-89-00278-CV
07/18/1989
Miscellaneous civil
San Patricio County
Nueces County
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/20/1990Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/03/1990Sworn Statement filed
11/28/1990Motion to Withdraw ____________ Filed
10/26/1990Mandate Issued
09/27/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
09/06/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
12/21/1989Submitted
12/21/1989Submission
12/18/1989Reply Brief Filed
11/28/1989Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
11/17/1989Submission
09/28/1989Due date for record to be filed
09/05/1989Oral argument requested
09/05/1989Brief Filed
08/11/1989Oral argument requested
08/11/1989Appendix filed
08/11/1989Brief Filed
08/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/18/1989Exhibits Filed
07/18/1989Transcript Filed
07/18/1989Deposition filed
07/18/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/26/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
135th District Court
Refugio
Honorable Marion M Lewis
4704