judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00826-CR
05-89-00826-CR
07/17/1989
All Misdemeanors
Glenn, David Milton
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/10/2020Order enteredDestroy
12/06/1991Writ DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/31/1991Writ Filed
05/10/1991Mandate Issued
05/10/1991Mandate Issued
05/01/1991Case Returned from Higher Ct.
12/17/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FiledRefused
11/16/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
10/22/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
10/05/1990Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
10/05/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/05/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/02/1990Submission
10/02/1990Submitted
10/02/1990Submission
10/02/1990Submitted
08/27/1990Letter Filed
08/20/1990MattConv
07/25/1990Mot.-Ext. File Sup Brief DispMotion or Writ Denied
07/25/1990Motion to Correct DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/09/1990Case ready to be set
04/09/1990Mot Ext Time Sup Sfacts DispMotion or Writ Granted
04/09/1990Brief Filed
04/09/1990Case ready to be set
04/05/1990Supplemental Statement of Facts Filed
04/05/1990Supplemental Transcript filed
03/27/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/26/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/26/1990Mot Ext Time File Sup Sfacts
02/27/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/26/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/16/1990Letter Sent by the Court
01/10/1990Brief Filed
12/07/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/06/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/13/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
11/10/1989Statement of Facts Filed
11/08/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
11/01/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Denied
10/31/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
09/12/1989Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/08/1989Extend Time to File Record
09/08/1989Motion for Leave to File
09/01/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Denied
08/31/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
08/28/1989Letter Sent by the Court
07/17/1989Transcript Filed
07/17/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/29/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
06/16/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/10/2020Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 3
Collin
3-522-88
60/180da Prob & $500 Fine