judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-94-00094-CV
12-94-00094-CV
04/07/1994
Injunction
Tyler Junior College
Williams, Tara and Angelica Rivers
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/28/2012Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
08/15/1994
08/15/1994Case stored
08/10/1994Mandate Issued
08/10/1994No Description Available.
07/25/1994
07/08/1994
06/23/1994Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
06/23/1994Opinion issuedDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
06/23/1994Case ready to be set
06/23/1994Submission
06/23/1994Submitted
04/12/1994Letter from the Court
04/07/1994No Description Available.
04/07/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/04/1994Surety Bond Filed
03/04/1994Order Entered
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/28/2012Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Tyler Junior CollegeAppellantMr. J. Bennett White
Williams, Tara & Angelica RiveAppelleeMr. Barry L. Goodwin
Mr. Bill D. Rosenstein
Trial Court Information
241st District Court
Smith
Honorable Sam B. Bournias
94-332-C