judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 94-0318
94-0318
04/07/1994
See former TRAP 130(D)
PAUL HOUSTON and JEANETTE HOUSTON
ROYCE COLEMAN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/03/1994Reply to ResponseRespondent
05/10/1994Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
04/20/1994Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedPetitionerreply to mo/re of 130(d)
04/19/1994Motion for RehearingMotion for extension of time to file App Writ Err.on behalf of respondent, Royce Coleman
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
10/18/1994Record returned to Court of AppealsNo Mo/Re filed
09/15/1994Motion for Rehearing - Disposeddismissed as mootCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info.
09/15/1994Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedW/Resp's mo/re of m/e/t to file app dismissed as moot.
09/15/1994Motion for Rehearing - Disposeddismissed as moot
06/09/1994Case forwarded to Court
06/03/1994Reply to Response
05/31/1994Notice requesting filing fee$5 to J. Jeffrey Springer for Reply
05/10/1994Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/21/1994Phone call from Clerk's Officeto COA - spoke with OTHA - app was filed 04-21-94 (1 day late) they rec'd app and will forward to us for disposal
04/20/1994Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedreply to mo/re of 130(d)
04/19/1994Motion for Rehearingon behalf of respondent, Royce Coleman
04/19/1994Motion for Rehearing forwardedRecord remains in Clerk's office Orig & 1 fwd.
04/14/1994Notice requesting filing feem/e/t to file reply $10.00 - to J. Jeffrey Springer
04/07/1994APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ERROR IS DUE TO BE FILEDM/E/T granted app due 04-20-94
04/07/1994Extension of time to file app writ err disposed ofFiling grantedM/E/T to file app granted till 04/20/94
04/07/1994Extension of time to file app writ err filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
10/18/1994Case StoredCase stored.No Mo/Re filed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
COLEMAN, ROYCERespondentMr. J. Jeffrey Springer
HOUSTON, PAULPetitionerMr. Richard H. Kelsey
HOUSTON, JEANETTEPetitionerMr. Richard H. Kelsey
Court of Appeals Information:
05-92-00963-CV
Reversed & Rendered
RULE 90, 01-07-94
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
366th District Court
Collin
Honorable Nathan E. White
366-1883-89