judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-94-00097-CV
07-94-00097-CV
04/08/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Hur, Woon, Myeng Hee Hur & Wood Young Hur
City of Mesquite & Ted Barron
No
5th Court of Appeals
04/08/1994
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/27/1995Mandate Issued
11/06/1995Case Returned from Higher Court
06/06/1995Case Forwarded to Higher Court
05/26/1995Writ of Habeas Corpus, Prohibition, Etc.
04/24/1995Mot. for extension of time to file Rehearing DispGRANT
04/24/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
02/27/1995Response to any order, inquiry or motion
02/27/1995Response to any order, inquiry or motion
02/23/1995Do not use
02/23/1995Mot. for extension of time to file rehearing filed
02/03/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed,Reversed & Remanded to Trial Court
09/26/1994Submitted
09/26/1994Submission
09/21/1994Supplemental Brief Filed
09/12/1994Submission
07/29/1994Brief Filed
07/29/1994Case ready to be set
07/06/1994Brief Filed
07/06/1994Do not use
07/06/1994Motion to Supplement the Record DisposedGRANT
06/20/1994Motion to Supplement the Record Filed
06/07/1994Response to any order, inquiry or motion
06/03/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
06/03/1994Motion to Accelerate DisposedMotion Mooted
06/01/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
06/01/1994Motion to Accelerate Appeal Filed
05/05/1994Do not use
04/14/1994Mot. for extension of time to file record disposedGRANT
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
03/23/1994Do not use
03/23/1994Mot. for extension of time to file record filed
03/23/1994Motion - Ext to File Bond DispGRANT
03/18/1994Response to any order, inquiry or motion
03/09/1994Motion - Ext. to File Bond
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/27/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hur, Woon Myeng Hee Hur & WooAppellantW. Jeffrey Muskopf
City Of Mesquite & Ted BarronAppelleeDeanne C. Ayers
Trial Court Information
95th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Joe B. Brown
88-12175-D