judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1045-89
PD-1045-89
07/17/1989
PDR Case Type
HAYES, RUBIN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/24/1989RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/06/1989FINAL DISPRefused
09/20/1989PDR DISPRefused
07/24/1989RESPONSE FILED
07/17/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/16/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
HAYES, RUBINApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)N. R. Stevenson
STATE OF TEXASStateRichard L. Hattox
Court of Appeals Information:
02-88-00210-CR
Aff 6-8-89
2nd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
355th District Court
Hood
Honorable RALPH H. WALTON, JR.
5591