judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00661-CV
14-89-00661-CV
07/17/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Davis, Ethelyn
State of Texas for Best Interest of Davis, Ethelyn
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/07/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
04/24/1990Case stored
04/09/1990Mandate Issued
04/09/1990Mandate Issued
03/09/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
02/22/1990Opinion issuedDISMISSED
02/22/1990Opinion issuedDISMISSED
02/21/1990Submitted
02/21/1990Submission
02/21/1990Submitted
08/02/1989No description available.
07/21/1989No description available.
07/17/1989Transcript FILED
07/17/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/12/1989Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/07/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantHon. Rory R. Olsen
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeMelinda Brents
Trial Court Information
Probate Court No 3
Harris
48,075