judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00959-CV
05-89-00959-CV
08/11/1989
Contract
F & P Builders, a Partnership & C. S. Freeman & Linda Pierce
Lowe's of Texas, Inc.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/14/1997Record RetentionRetain
05/31/1990Mandate Issued
05/31/1990Mandate Issued
04/06/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
03/16/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
03/01/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/01/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/01/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/13/1990Motion to Show Authorities
02/13/1990Submission
02/13/1990Submitted
02/13/1990Submission
02/13/1990Submitted
01/31/1990Mot.-Ext. File Sup Brief DispMotion or Writ Granted
01/30/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
01/30/1990Mot. for Ext. File Sup. Brief
12/21/1989MattConv
10/20/1989Motion to Substitute Attorney DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/17/1989Response to Motion
10/11/1989Motion to Substitute Attorney
10/06/1989Brief Filed
10/06/1989Case ready to be set
10/06/1989Case ready to be set
09/11/1989Brief Filed
09/11/1989MattConv
08/11/1989Transcript Filed
08/11/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/13/1989Appeal Bond Filed
06/13/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/31/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 2
Dallas
Honorable Glen R. Snyder
CC89-1429-B