judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1040-89
PD-1040-89
07/17/1989
PDR Case Type
GARCIA, ARTURO NAVARRO
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/03/1989FINAL DISPRefused
10/18/1989PDR DISPRefused
08/17/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
07/17/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/13/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
GARCIA, ARTURO NAVARROApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Mr. E. Dale Robertson
STATE OF TEXASStateBen Euresti
Court of Appeals Information:
13-88-00315-CR
Aff 5-4-89
13th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
107th District Court
Cameron
Honorable GILBERTO HINOJOSA
87-CR-1147-A