judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00857-CV
05-89-00857-CV
07/20/1989
Miscellaneous civil
State Farm Lloyds, Inc.
Paula Mallow Williams & William Scott Wallace
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/20/1997Record RetentionRetain
01/09/1991Mandate Issued
01/09/1991Mandate Issued
12/27/1990Case Returned from Higher Ct.Refused - No Reversible Error
07/06/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
07/05/1990MattConv
06/28/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
06/28/1990MattConv
05/29/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
05/29/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
05/10/1990Response to Motion
05/07/1990Response to Motion
04/30/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/27/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/13/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
04/13/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
02/27/1990Submission
02/27/1990Submitted
02/27/1990Submission
02/27/1990Submitted
12/21/1989MattConv
11/22/1989Supplemental Brief Filed
11/06/1989Mot.-Ext. File Sup Brief DispMotion or Writ Granted
11/02/1989Mot. for Ext. File Sup. Brief
10/31/1989Supplemental Brief Filed
10/25/1989Mot.-Ext. File Sup Brief DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/24/1989Response to Motion
10/16/1989Response to Motion
10/13/1989Brief Filed
10/13/1989Case ready to be set
10/13/1989Letter Filed
10/13/1989Case ready to be set
09/20/1989Brief Filed
08/15/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/11/1989Letter Filed
08/11/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/03/1989Mot Ext Time File Strans DispMotion or Writ Granted
08/03/1989Mot Ext Time File Strans DispMotion or Writ Denied
07/26/1989Mot Ext Time File Strans
07/26/1989Response to Motion
07/24/1989MattConv
07/24/1989Mot - Ext. to File Transcript
07/20/1989Transcript Filed
07/20/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/20/1989Appeal Bond Filed
05/25/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/09/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Honorable Richard A. Bosworth
88-312 &312A