judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00740-CR
01-89-00740-CR
07/20/1989
Other Felony
Minske, Shelley Ann
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/30/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
04/30/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
04/19/1990Opinion issuedDismissed
04/19/1990Opinion issuedDismissed
04/10/1990Submitted
04/10/1990Submission
04/10/1990Submitted
02/22/1990Reset submission date
02/15/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
02/15/1990Reset submission dateGrant motion
02/12/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
02/12/1990Reset submission date
01/26/1990Submission
01/03/1990Case ready to be set
01/03/1990Waiver
01/03/1990Case ready to be set
12/21/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
11/22/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Motion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
11/10/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
10/12/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
09/26/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
09/08/1989Transcript filed
08/24/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.
08/11/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
07/20/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/13/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
07/13/1989Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/30/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StateCriminal - AppellantLouis Gusemano
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 13
Harris
911,427
30 days