judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00733-CR
01-89-00733-CR
07/18/1989
Misdemeanor
Ordonez, Mario A.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/27/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
02/27/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/19/1991No petition for review or writ of error was filed
01/04/1991Motion for rehearing was not filed
12/20/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/20/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/14/1990Submitted
02/14/1990Submission
02/14/1990Submitted
12/12/1989Submission
11/16/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
11/16/1989Case ready to be set
11/16/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
11/16/1989Case ready to be set
11/13/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
10/31/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
10/06/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
09/28/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
09/15/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
09/08/1989Brief due for retained counsel
08/02/1989Statement of facts filed
08/02/1989Transcript filed
07/18/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/14/1989Notice of appeal filed
06/21/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/27/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of Texas
StateCriminal - State of Texas
StateCriminal - State of Texas
StateCriminal - AppellantFrank Alvarez
StateCriminal - State of TexasJack R. Stern
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 1
Fort Bend
Honorable THOMAS RALPH CULVER
41385
$300, $81.50 ct cst, 12 pr