judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 06-89-00109-CR
06-89-00109-CR
07/19/1989
Sexual Abuse or Rape of Child
Cardenas, Pedro
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/14/1991Mandate issued
12/28/1990Case Returned from Higher Ct.
11/21/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FiledWRIT REFUSED
09/25/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
09/10/1990Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
08/14/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/03/1990Submitted
07/03/1990Submission
06/05/1990Submission
05/30/1990Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/29/1990MOTION FILED
05/07/1990Submission
05/01/1990Case ready to be set
05/01/1990Motion to File DispMotion or Writ Granted
05/01/1990Request for Oral Argument
04/27/1990Holding for Record
04/27/1990Brief Filed
04/27/1990Motion for leave to file
03/27/1990Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/22/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
03/22/1990Holding for Record
03/22/1990MOTION FILED
03/13/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/13/1990Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/08/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/06/1990MOTION FILED
03/06/1990Holding for Record
02/13/1990Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/07/1990MOTION FILED
02/07/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
02/07/1990Holding for Record
02/06/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/29/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/08/1990Brief Filed
12/07/1989Statement of Facts Filed
10/10/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/02/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
09/28/1989Transcript Filed
07/25/1989Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/19/1989MOTION FILED
07/19/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/14/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
8th District Court
Delta
6002
50 years TDC