judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-94-00522-CR
05-94-00522-CR
03/30/1994
Assault or Attempted Murder
Madden, Roland Jerome
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/09/1997Letter Sent by the Court
03/03/1997Letter Received
04/20/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
04/20/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
03/30/1994Notice Sent
03/30/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/16/1994Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
03/16/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/20/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 1
Dallas
Honorable Janice L. Warder
F93-41793-KH
Life, TDC