judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-89-00286-CR
13-89-00286-CR
07/21/1989
appeal by the SOT on Motion to Suppress GR by TC
Texas, The State of
Torres, Raul Sergio
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/04/1991Mandate Recd Ct Crim App / Dt. Clk
03/21/1991Record checked out
02/06/1991Mandate Issued
02/04/1991Record checked in
01/30/1991Motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/14/1991Higher Court DecisionDismissed
01/10/1991Higher Court DecisionAffirmed
01/10/1991Higher Court DecisionDismissed
01/10/1991Decision Withdrawn
03/28/1990Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Granted
02/07/1990Cite for opinions
01/26/1990Court of Crim. Appeals Number
01/18/1990Petition for Discretionary Review sent to S.Ct.
01/18/1990Petition for Review
01/12/1990Petition for Review
12/21/1989Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
12/15/1989Motion for rehearing filed
11/30/1989Motion to Supplement DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/30/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/26/1989Submitted
10/26/1989Submission
10/10/1989Panel change on case on SMIS or SMIT
10/05/1989Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
09/19/1989Submission
08/31/1989Motion for leave to file Supp. Trans. DISPOSEDCarried with the case
08/31/1989Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/31/1989Motion for Leave to File Record DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/31/1989Motion for leave to file Supp. Trans. DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
08/24/1989Motion for leave to file supplemental transcript
08/24/1989Supplemental transcript recieved
08/24/1989Supplemental transcript filed
08/21/1989Brief received.
08/21/1989Brief Filed
08/08/1989Motion for leave to file amended SOF
08/08/1989Motion for leave to file supplemental transcript
08/08/1989Supplemental page
08/08/1989Supplemental transcript recieved
08/08/1989Brief received.
08/08/1989Supplemental transcript filed
08/08/1989Brief Filed
08/08/1989Case ready to be set
08/02/1989Green card in
07/28/198910 day letter sent
07/27/1989Motion for Leave to File Record
07/27/1989Statement of Facts Received
07/27/1989Transcript Filed
07/27/1989Transcript Received
07/27/1989Statement of Facts Filed
07/27/1989Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
07/25/1989Due date for record to be filed
07/21/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/21/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/06/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
357th District Court
Cameron
Honorable Rogelio Valdez
89-CR-597-E
dismissed by docket entry