judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-94-00179-CV
04-94-00179-CV
03/30/1994
Summary Judgment
Cobb, Jr., Earle
Thurmond, Thomas M. & Clark, John E.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/17/1995Mandate Issued
10/17/1995Mandate Issued
10/02/1995Case Returned from Higher Court
09/21/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
08/01/1995Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Denied
06/01/1995Information regarding cause received
05/12/1995Case Forwarded to Higher Court
04/18/1995Appendix Filed
04/18/1995Appendix Filed
04/18/1995Response to Motion Filed
04/18/1995Response to Motion Filed
04/06/1995Continuation of Information from previous event
04/06/1995Continuation of Information from previous event
04/06/1995Information regarding cause received
03/27/1995Writ of Error filed
03/15/1995Information regarding cause received
03/09/1995Motion for Rehearing En Banc DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/09/1995Motion to Recuse DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/09/1995Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/09/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/07/1995Information regarding cause received
02/23/1995Information regarding cause receivedOverruled
02/23/1995Information regarding cause receivedOverruled
02/23/1995Information regarding cause receivedOverruled
02/13/1995Response to Motion Filed
02/03/1995Response to Motion Filed
02/03/1995Information regarding cause received
02/03/1995Information regarding cause received
02/03/1995Information regarding cause received
01/30/1995Information regarding cause received
01/30/1995Information regarding cause received
01/27/1995Information regarding cause received
01/27/1995Information regarding cause received
01/27/1995Information regarding cause received
01/18/1995Motion Filed
01/18/1995Motion for Rehearing En Banc Filed
01/18/1995Motion for Rehearing Filed
01/17/1995Motion to Recuse Filed
01/17/1995Motion to Recuse Filed
01/11/1995Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/11/1995Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/11/1995Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/11/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/11/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/11/1995Motion for Rehearing En Banc DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/11/1995Motion for Rehearing En Banc DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/11/1995Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/11/1995Opinion issuedMotion or Writ Denied
01/11/1995Opinion Withdrawn
12/23/1994Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/23/1994Motion to Recuse DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/23/1994Motion to Recuse DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/23/1994Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/23/1994Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/13/1994Response to Motion Filed
12/12/1994Response to Motion Filed
12/06/1994Motion Filed
12/05/1994Amended Motion Filed
12/05/1994Amended Motion Filed
12/05/1994Amended Motion Filed
11/30/1994Motion Filed
11/30/1994Motion for Rehearing En Banc Filed
11/30/1994Motion for Rehearing Filed
11/28/1994Motion Filed
11/28/1994Motion Filed
11/28/1994Motion Filed
11/28/1994Motion Filed
11/28/1994Motion to Recuse Filed
11/23/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/23/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/18/1994Supplemental Authorities Received
11/17/1994Submitted
11/17/1994Submission
11/17/1994Submitted
10/14/1994Submission
07/01/1994Requests Oral Argument
07/01/1994Mot-Oral Argument DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/27/1994Verification Filed
06/24/1994Reply brief filed
06/20/1994Mot-Oral Argument Filed
06/16/1994Case ready to be set
06/16/1994Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/16/1994Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/16/1994Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/16/1994Case ready to be set
06/01/1994Response to Motion Filed
06/01/1994Response to Motion Filed
05/27/1994Reply brief filed
05/26/1994Amended Motion Filed
05/26/1994Amended Motion Filed
05/24/1994Response to Motion Filed
05/23/1994Response to Motion Filed
05/23/1994Response to Motion Filed
05/20/1994Brief Filed
05/20/1994Motion Filed
05/20/1994Motion Filed
05/20/1994Motion for Dismissal Filed
04/26/1994Brief Filed
04/26/1994Requests Oral Argument
04/08/1994Alternative Dispute Resolution Procedure Sent
03/30/1994No Description Available.
03/30/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
01/25/1994Appeal Bond Filed
12/28/1993Motion for New Trial Filed
12/02/1993Judgment Signed in Trial Court
12/02/1993Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/17/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Thomas M. ThurmondAppelleeThomas M. Thurmond
Earle Cobb, Jr.AppellantEarle E. Cobb, Jr.
John E. ClarkAppelleeJohn E. Clark
Trial Court Information
285th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable J. T. Brite
93-CI-17114
N/A