judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-94-00132-CV
09-94-00132-CV
03/30/1994
Divorce
Heiselbetz, Jr., Earl Carl
Heiselbetz, Rebecca Lynne
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/20/1994Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
04/15/1994Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/07/1994Order EnteredMotion or Writ Denied
03/31/1994Mot - Ext. to File Transcript
03/30/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/07/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Powers, NellDistrict or County ClerksNell Powers
Heiselbetz, Jr., Earl CarlAppellantEarl Carl Heiselbetz, Jr.
Heiselbetz, Rebecca LynneAppelleeMichael S. Ratcliff
Trial Court Information
1st District Court
Jasper
Honorable Joe Bob Golden
15863