judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-94-00178-CV
03-94-00178-CV
04/06/1994
Tax
Kincer Oil Company, Inc.
John Sharp, Comptroller of Public Accounts of the State of Texas; Martha Whitehead, Successor in Office to Kay Bailey Hutchison, Treasurer of the State of Texas; and Dan Morales, Attorney General of the State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/30/2004Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
10/22/1996CASE STORED
12/23/1994Mandate Issued
10/12/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Dismissed
10/12/1994Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/12/1994Opinion issuedDismissed
09/19/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/19/1994Case reinstated
09/19/1994Motion for Dismissal Filed
09/19/1994Case reinstated
06/08/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief received
06/08/1994Motion to Abate Appeal GrantedMotion or Writ Granted
06/08/1994Order EnteredAbated
05/27/1994Mot ext time file STRANS DispMotion or Writ Granted
05/25/1994Motion to Abate Appeal Filed
05/17/1994Supplemental Transcript filed
05/09/1994Mt extension of time file Supplemental Trans filed
05/06/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/02/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/13/1994Response requested (postcard)
04/06/1994Transcript Filed
04/06/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/23/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Kincer Oil Company, Inc.AppellantMr. Stephen P. Streety
Sharp, Comptroller, John Of PuAppelleeMr. Ricardo Meza
The Honorable Dan Morales
Whitehead, Martha Successor IAppelleeMr. Ricardo Meza
The Honorable Dan Morales
Morales, Dan Attorney GeneralAppelleeThe Honorable Dan Morales
Mr. Ricardo Meza
Trial Court Information
53rd District Court
Travis
93-00311