judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 94-0317
94-0317
04/06/1994
App Writ of Error
CHESTER WILLIAM INGRAM M.D.
BARBARA DALE SMITH ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
08/01/1994Motion for RehearingPetitionerentitled "M/L/F Mo/Re and Mo/Re en banc" Rule 4(b) envelope attached
04/18/1994Reply to ResponseRespondent
04/06/1994Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/01/1994Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruledMo/Re Overruled
09/01/1994Record returned to Court of AppealsMo/Re Overruled
08/01/1994Conditional motion for rehearingNo description available.CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
08/01/1994Motion for Rehearingentitled "M/L/F Mo/Re and Mo/Re en banc" Rule 4(b) envelope attached
08/01/1994Motion for Rehearing forwardedrecord remains in clerk's office
07/01/1994Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedMO/RE DUE 7/31/94
07/01/1994MOTION FOR REHEARING DUE TO BE FILED07-31-94
06/30/1994Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing
06/15/1994Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedas amended
06/03/1994Motion to Amend disposedFiling grantedPetitionbers motion to amended app
06/03/1994Amended Application for Writ of ErrorFILED - motion to amend granted
05/31/1994Letter Receivedre: status of amended app writ err
05/31/1994Letter sent to parties from Supreme Court - See Remarksin response to inquiry of status
04/25/1994Motion to amend application for writ of error
04/25/1994Amended Application for Writ of Error
04/21/1994Case forwarded to Court
04/18/1994Reply to Response
04/06/1994Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
09/01/1994Case StoredCase stored.Mo/Re Overruled
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
SMITH, BRAD ERNESTRespondentMr. Bal V. Kale
INGRAM, M.D., CHESTER WILLIAMPetitionerChester William Ingram Jr.
SMITH, BARBARA DALERespondentMr. Bal V. Kale
SMITH, BRENT DANIELRespondentMr. Bal V. Kale
SMITH, JAMES ERNESTRespondentMr. Bal V. Kale
ATTORNEY AD LITEMRespondentThe Honorable Ernest L. McClendon Jr.
SMITH, LISA RENEERespondentMr. Bal V. Kale
Court of Appeals Information:
09-93-00285-CV
Dismissed WOJ
___ SW2d ___, 03-10-94
9th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
258th District Court
Polk
13331-A