judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-94-00542-CR
05-94-00542-CR
04/05/1994
Other Felony
Flores, Wilfredo
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/01/1995Case stored
05/01/1995Mandate Issued
05/01/1995Mandate Issued
04/24/1995Mandate due to be issued
02/24/1995Motion to Withdraw Appeal DisposedWithdrawn
02/24/1995Motion to Withdraw Appeal DisposedWithdrawn
02/14/1995Motion to Withdraw Appeal
01/10/1995Submission
01/10/1995Submitted
01/10/1995Submission
01/10/1995Submitted
12/01/1994MattConv
07/29/1994Brief Filed
07/29/1994Case ready to be set
07/29/1994Case ready to be set
07/18/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/01/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/20/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/16/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/13/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
04/06/1994Brief Filed
04/06/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
04/05/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
12/02/1993MattConv
12/02/1993Statement of Facts Filed
06/04/1993Transcript Filed
04/30/1993Notice of Appeal Filed
04/30/1993Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/01/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3
Dallas
Honorable Mark S Tolle
F92-44211-QJ
5 yrs TDC