judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-94-00336-CR
01-94-00336-CR
04/06/1994
Robbery
Basse, Stephen
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/18/1995Case stored
07/18/1995Mandate issued
06/27/1995Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
05/31/1995Petition for discretionary review disposedRefused
04/06/1995Case file received by higher Court or agency.
04/04/1995Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
03/28/1995Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
03/02/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/02/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/31/1995Submitted
01/31/1995Submission
01/31/1995Submitted
12/01/1994Submission
10/24/1994Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
10/24/1994Case ready to be set
10/24/1994Case ready to be set
10/06/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
09/28/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
08/31/1994Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
08/25/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
08/16/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
07/28/1994Motion strans disposedGrant motion
07/28/1994No description available.
07/18/1994Motion for leave to file strans
07/14/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
07/01/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
06/02/1994Statement of facts filed
06/02/1994Transcript filed
04/06/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/05/1994Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
04/05/1994Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/18/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StateCriminal - AppellantRoland Brice Moore, III
StateCriminal - State of TexasScott A. Durfee
Trial Court Information
262nd District Court
Harris
677,511
99 yrs tdc