judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-94-00152-CR
07-94-00152-CR
04/08/1994
Sexual Abuse or Rape of Child
Wier, James Matthew
The State of Texas
No
5th Court of Appeals
04/08/1994
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/03/1996Mandate Issued
03/11/1996Opinion issuedDismissed
03/05/1996Submitted
03/05/1996Submission
02/23/1996Submission
12/01/1995Submission Vacated
10/18/1995Submission
08/21/1995Brief Filed
08/21/1995Case ready to be set
08/01/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
07/31/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
07/13/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
07/03/1995Brief Filed
05/10/1995Order entered
01/18/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
01/17/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
12/15/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
12/14/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
11/15/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
10/10/1994Motion to Substitute AttorneyGRANT
09/06/1994Do not use
09/06/1994Motion to Supplement the Record FiledGRANT
08/09/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
08/08/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
06/28/1994Letter of Inquiry filed
04/18/1994Do not use
04/12/1994Do not use
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
04/08/1984Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/03/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Wier, James MatthewCriminal - AppellantGary Noble
Michelle Phillips Scheef
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJohn C. Vance
Trial Court Information
291st District Court
Dallas
Honorable Gerry Holden Meier
F92-26067-KU
6 yrs, TDC